Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case represented by Zide, Flint C. Law Office Of Harris & Zide, Llp, against Jorge Mosqueda, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions473 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time473 days |
Declaration Non Military Service -
Date: May 13, 2019Judgment After Trial -
Date: August 28, 2020Notice Continuance -
Date: May 22, 2020Order Continuance -
Date: June 19, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 28, 2020Notice Continuance -
Date: March 25, 2020Order -
Date: February 28, 2020Jury Trial Expedited-Ord Granting Opt Out -
Date: February 03, 2020Notice Hearing -
Date: February 04, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 27, 2020Motion Admissions -
Date: January 24, 2020Jury Trial Expedited-Request to Opt Out -
Date: January 21, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 10, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: October 25, 2019Notice Hearing -
Date: September 24, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: September 24, 2019Fee Waiver Order Full -
Date: September 24, 2019Summons -
Date: May 13, 2019Answer -
Date: September 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: May 13, 2019Complaint -
Date: May 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | Judgment Entered | ||
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment After Trial - | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
August 26, 2020 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Continuance - | |
June 03, 2020 | State of Emergency | ||
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Continuance - | |
April 08, 2020 | State of Emergency | ||
April 02, 2020 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Continuance - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.