Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jerry Buck, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Alex Shtanko, Amy Solovyova, David Tveretinov, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions42 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time42 days |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Placer. The plaintiff, Jerry Buck, is alleging unlawful detainer against the defendants, Alex Shtanko, Amy Solovyova, and David Tveretinov. The jurisdict...
Answer -
Date: May 08, 2018Writ Possession - Issued -
Date: June 11, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 07, 2018Complaint -
Date: April 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Filed | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
June 11, 2018 | Heard: Taken Under Submission | ||
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ Possession - Issued - | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Court | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Time and Place for Trial | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Set Case For Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.