Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
George Knowlton, Story Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Civil case against George Knowlton, Story Rentals, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts with Appellate Department presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | M-CV-0067944 STORY RENTALS v. KNOWLTON, GEORGE Plaintiff Story Rentals, Inc.’s Motion to Reopen Discovery The motion is denied. In the current request, plaintiff seeks to reopen discovery under Code o... | |
February 24, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | M-CV-0067944 STORY RENTALS v. KNOWLTON, GEORGE Defendant George Knowlton’s Motion to Continue Trial and Motion to Reconsider Sanctions for Failure to Appear The motion is granted. The court trial is c... | |
December 15, 2020 | |||
October 19, 2020 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
October 09, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
October 09, 2020 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
October 01, 2020 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
September 23, 2020 | Petition Granted (435220) | ||
September 18, 2020 | Continued by Court: Other | ||
September 17, 2020 | Dropped from Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.