Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Laurie Deuschel, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2013 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2014 | Judgment Entered | ||
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Other | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof Service | |
May 23, 2014 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
May 22, 2014 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 04, 2014 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.