Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Roseville case against Laurel Hanson, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2013 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Roseville |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time221 days |
Abstract Judgment- Filed -
Date: November 29, 2018Writ Execution - Issued -
Date: October 07, 2020Memorandum Costs -
Date: October 07, 2020Writ Execution - Filed -
Date: September 13, 2018Abstract Judgment- Issued -
Date: November 01, 2018Writ Execution - Issued -
Date: December 14, 2017Memorandum Costs -
Date: December 14, 2017Document Other -
Date: October 20, 2017Abstract Judgment- Issued -
Date: October 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Issued - | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum Costs - | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract Judgment- Filed - | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract Judgment- Filed | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract Judgment- Issued | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract Judgment- Issued - | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ Execution - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.