Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Darwish Barbara, Darwish David, Darwish Eden, Nede Mgmt. Inc. A Wyoming Corporation, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Stillman Philip H., against Aspen American Insurance Company A, Deans And Homer A California, represented by Borovsky David Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management167 days |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: June 27, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -
Date: July 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: August 01, 2018Other - - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND APPOINT ARBITRATION
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Status Conference and Order -
Date: August 06, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: August 23, 2018Declaration -
Date: August 23, 2018Response -
Date: August 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Motion -
Date: August 27, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2018Proof of Service - No Service -
Date: August 30, 2018Response to Petition -
Date: August 31, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Response
Date: August 31, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion-Compel
Date: September 10, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration
Date: September 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition
Date: September 14, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -
Date: September 27, 2018Notice -
Date: September 28, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply to Opposition
Date: October 02, 2018Brief - Brief supplemental- in opposition to motion to compel arbitration
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - (Legacy Event Type : Motion To Strike)
Date: October 16, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: November 06, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/06/2018
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 08, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: March 05, 2019Order - Order Proposed Order of Dismissal of Petition to Compel Arbitration
Date: March 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Order of Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
March 05, 2019 | Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order | ||
March 05, 2019 | Order - Order Proposed Order of Dismissal of Petition to Compel Arbitration | ||
March 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Order (Proposed Order of Dismissal of Petition to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Aspen American Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant) |
|
March 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk |
|
January 15, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | ||
January 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
December 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Aspen American Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2018 | Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.