Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Siegel Jeffrey, Lumenello Aldea C., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mary Thornton House presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryConservatorship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Hearing |
Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Petition Hearing (Conservatorship/Guardianship) |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Fix Out of State Residence filed on December 13, 2021 by DENISE VILLALOVUS. ) | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Death (Notice of Death ) Filed by Conservator |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Attorney |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - Fix Out of State Residence Filed by Attorney |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Investigator General/Limited Cons'r Review Report | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ) Filed by Court |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification - Cons/Guard Address ) Filed by Conservator |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Post-Move Notice of Change of Residence Filed by Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.