Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Adrian, Jennifer filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Schultz, Paul, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with Alva, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlva, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.
Date: February 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Adrian, Jennifer.
Date: February 10, 2021Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Paul Schultz.
Date: March 04, 2021Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Jennifer Adrian.
Date: February 11, 2021Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/11/2021.
Date: February 11, 2021Request to Continue Court Hearing filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: March 04, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Civil for Order re: Continuance filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 05, 2021Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - Civil for Order re: Continuance filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Adrian, Jennifer.
Date: February 10, 2021Request to Continue Court Hearing filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: March 04, 2021Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Schultz, Paul.
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Warner, David P. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Schultz, Paul. MC050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL WITHOUT COURT ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL WITHOUT COURT ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Substitution of Attorney filed by Schultz, Paul. Substitution of Attorney Judge: Warner, David P. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL WITHOUT COURT ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Substitution of Attorney filed by Schultz, Paul. Judge: Warner, David P. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Sarah M Hoff, retained for Paul Schultz .
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Schultz, Paul. CH120 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED RECORD SEALED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Schultz, Paul. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED CH120 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on April 5, 2021.
Judge: Warner, David P. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC and Temporary Restraining Order held on 04/05/2021 08:30 AM . MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail - Civil for Order re: Continuance filed by Schultz, Paul. POS030 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.