Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
A-L Financial Corp., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Alarcon, Edgardo L Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with Alva, Jose L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlva, Jose L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Case Cycle Time3384 days |
Minutes finalized for Bench Warrant Hearing held on 03/01/2019 10:30 AM .
Date: March 01, 2019Minutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment held on 11/01/2021 01:30 PM .
Date: November 01, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: September 22, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by A-L Financial Corp..RE: Renewal of Judgment
Date: October 19, 2020Application for Renewal of Judgment filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: October 06, 2020Authorization to Appear filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: September 14, 2018Authorization to Appear filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: March 01, 2019Minutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment held on 09/14/2018 10:30 AM .
Date: September 14, 2018Civil Bench Warrant Returned w/POS; Cost $50.00
Date: February 01, 2019Proof of Personal Service $50.00 8/13/2018 - filed by A-L Financial Corp..
Date: August 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Appearance and Examination of Judgment , set for 04/04/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
SC134 APPLICATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETS AND TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED Application and Order for Appearance and Examination filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Payment received by A-L Financial Corp. in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 720530.
Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $260.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $443.98 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Dropped
Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment held on 11/01/2021 01:30 PM . Judge: Holly, Carter |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Edgardo L Alarcon Jr on 10/22/2021 to Sacramento County.
Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by A-L Financial Corp. in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 690973.
Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $292.93 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Alva, Jose L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.