Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Rockefeller Commerce Center, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell Llp, against Does 1 To 10, Lcf Labs, Inc., represented by Chung & Ignacio Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2023 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Rockefeller Commerce Center LLC, a California limited liability company, is suing LCF Labs, Inc., a California corporation, and other u...
Notice to defendant
Date: October 18, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: October 18, 2023Unlawful Detainer Complaint of >$25,000 Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: November 17, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 13, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 18, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: October 30, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer
Date: October 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 02, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: December 12, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: April 05, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 03, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 02, 2024Landlord-Tenant Case Coversheet Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Answer/Response Filed (Amendments) | |
January 29, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint Filed (Amendments) | |
December 18, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
December 14, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Joint Stipulation and Order following resolution of possession issue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.