Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ottero Rivera Luis C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ottero Maricela Z, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions54 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-15 ) | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-15 ) | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-15 ) | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-02-16 ) | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (COMMUNITY PROPERTY - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ottero Rivera, Luis - Filed and Entered on 2016-05-26 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ottero Rivera, Luis ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ottero Rivera, Luis ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ottero Rivera, Luis ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ottero Rivera, Luis ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.