Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Warren Lori, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Warren Brian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Marilyn M. Mordetzky presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions466 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time488 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (OUT:SHERRIE L. DAVIDSON / IN: PRO SE ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (OUT:SHERRIE L. DAVIDSON / IN: PRO SE ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (No Fee) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Continuance (No Fee) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Mordetzky Marilyn |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Marilyn |
|
December 02, 2019 | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.