Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Paronyan Rosie Varduhi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Badalian Musheg, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions300 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2001-04-11 ) | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2001-04-11 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received After Hearing (No SASE ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received After Hearing (No SASE ) | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Van Nuys East Dept. - K, Watkins, Shirley K, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted Judge: Watkins Shirley K |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Van Nuys East Dept. - K, Watkins, Shirley K, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted Judge: Shirley K |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Van Nuys East Dept. - K, Watkins, Shirley K, Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Not Held Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Not Held Judge: Watkins Shirley K |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Van Nuys East Dept. - K, Watkins, Shirley K, Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Not Held Judge: Shirley K |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Van Nuys East Dept. - K, Watkins, Shirley K, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Judge: Watkins Shirley K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.