Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Contreras Jose G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Contreras Liliana E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions437 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time455 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-08-26 ) | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-08-26 ) | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-08-26 ) | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Child Support Case Registry Form Received (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose - Filed and Entered on 2016-08-08 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose - Service Date on 2015-07-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-22 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Contreras, Jose - Filed and Entered on 2016-01-22 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.