Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Durrani Mishal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kamal Syed Akbar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-18 ) | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-18 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Durrani, Mishal ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Durrani, Mishal ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Durrani, Mishal ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Durrani, Mishal ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-18-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Durrani, Mishal ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.