Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Steele Heather Guyett, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Steele Christopher Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions18 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-30 ) | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Child Support Case Registry Form Received (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Steele, Heather ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2015-09-30 ) | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Steele, Heather ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Steele, Heather ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 08-06-15 ) | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response (**RESPONSE AND PAYMENT OF RESPONSE 1ST AP FEE WAS NOT ENTERED ON 6/19/15 AND WAS ENTERED IN SEPETEMBER 2015*** - On Behalf of: Respondent: Steele, Christopher - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-22 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Steele, Heather ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response (NON-PAYMENT OF 1ST APPEARANCE FEES - On Behalf of: Respondent: Steele, Christopher - Rejected on 2015-07-30 ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.