Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De Assis Enock Coelho, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against De Assis Laura M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions66 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application (for restoration of former name - On Behalf of: Respondent: De Assis, Laura - Filed and Entered on 2015-02-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous (RETURNED MAIL: conformed copy of req to enter default - (return to sender) - As to: Respondent: De Assis, Laura ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 11-20-14 ) | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Respondent: De Assis, Laura ) Filed by Respondent |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (FINAL WAIVED - On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: De Assis, Enock ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.