Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Karaban Melissa J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Abramson Bruce David, against Karaban Jason A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Virginia A. Phillips presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2011 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1927 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1947 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Karaban, Jason - Signed on 2016-07-12 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-23 ) | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-23 ) | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (- Filed and Entered on 2016-06-23 ) | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - Stipulated | |
June 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Karaban, Jason ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Karaban, Melissa - Filed and Entered on 2016-06-03 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Karaban, Melissa - Filed and Entered on 2016-05-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Karaban, Jason - Filed and Entered on 2016-05-12 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Karaban, Melissa - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-17 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.