Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gamache, Dan, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Ravera, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 1989 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 1998 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISM W/OUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION FILED | |
June 17, 1998 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF GENERAL CIVIL CASE 07/31/1998 09:01:00 AM D-4 | |
March 23, 1998 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF GENERAL CIVIL CASE 05/29/1998 09:01:00 AM D-4 | |
March 16, 1990 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT FILED | |
January 10, 1989 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 23, 1988 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.