Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Big Capital Ii Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Health Ultimate Corporation Dba Callmd A Nevada Corporation, Shabanets Igor, Sig Capital Inc. A Nevada Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Xxxxxx Xxxxx, Xxxxxx Capital Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Xxxxxx Group Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Health Ultimate Global A Nevada Limited Liability Company Nominal Defendants, represented by Pizarro Antony R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management145 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time741 days |
Notice of Ruling
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2019Notice -
Date: September 27, 2018Complaint -
Date: September 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -
Date: October 01, 2018Proof of Personal Service - OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail of Summons and Complaint
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 08, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 16, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 27, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 08, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 08, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: March 18, 2019Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: March 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP HEARING
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT
Date: April 25, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT
Date: May 01, 2019Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 08, 2019Answer
Date: May 14, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 30, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Lien
Date: July 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: July 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 02, 2019Order - ORDER RE MTC ARBITRATION
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 25, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: September 26, 2019Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 22, 2019RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL OF 8/3/2020 MINUTE ORDER
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 07, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/15/2019)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (of Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 02/19/2019)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/26/2019)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/18/2019)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice (regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); De...))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Default Judgment Prove up Hearing)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/08/2019)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration; Status Conference Re: Coun...))
Date: October 07, 2020RETURNED MAIL (of 8/3/2020 minute order)
Date: August 17, 2020Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proof of Service as ...))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Order (re MTC Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbit...))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration; Status Conference Re: Coun...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion for Relief from Default)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Vacate Default)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.