Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mejia Santos Evelyn, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by White Grace, against Akt Home Builders, Hodara Raul Mauricio, Hudson Insurance Company, represented by Cameron Clark Howard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Michael J. Convey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Convey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management322 days |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2018 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions207 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); As to: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Raul Mauricio Hodara (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Santos Evelyn Mejia on
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Santos Evelyn Mejia on
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Document:Motion-Set Aside Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Santos Evelyn Mejia on
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by SANTOS EVELYN MEJIA on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Raul Mauricio Hodara; On the Complaint filed by SANTOS EVELYN MEJIA on
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: AKT Home Builders (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Summons on Amended Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration Of Santos Evelyn Mejia; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice Amended Notice of Continuance of CMC and OSC; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of CMC and OSC; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice Discharge Chapter 7 Bankruptcy; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Continuance CMC; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: March 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)
Date: May 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE CMC
Date: October 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY
Date: October 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 03, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: March 03, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 30, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Motion-Set Aside
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Judgment; Ca...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Order To Continue Hearing)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (Of Santos Evelyn Mejia)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue 12/1/2020 CMC/OSC)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Default Judgment as D...))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Brief (Brief by Hudson Insurance Company Re Effect of Bankruptcy on Action Against Surety)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of CMC and OSC)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/09/2021)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Default Judgment as D...))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Continuance of CMC and OSC)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (Discharge Chapter 7 Bankruptcy)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (Continuance CMC)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 05/04/2021)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy ...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy ...))
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy as to defendant Raul Hodara;...))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of 03/03/2022)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Santos Evelyn Mejia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.