Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lopez Raysa, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Miller Richard Thomas, against Valenzona Stephanie Ofiana, Valenzona Vincent P., represented by Wong Paul Watt, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Case Cycle Time1016 days |
Notice (name extension) - Notice of trial setting conference
Date: November 13, 2018Notice (name extension) - Notice of Court Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: April 09, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: August 02, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)
Date: January 07, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: April 20, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 08, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Motion to Enforce Settlement Hearing
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion
Date: September 10, 2020Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Stephanie Ofiana Valenzona (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Mail Filed by: Plaintiff in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Mail Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: RAYSA LOPEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Vincent P. Valenzona (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of trial setting conference; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Vincent P. Valenzona (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Vincent P. Valenzona (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Raysa Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: September 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.