Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hilliger Michael Thomas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Arias Mickel Montalban, against Poghosyan Albert, Does 1 To 50, represented by Weinstein Mark Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with BERT GLENNON, JR presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2008 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Other |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request-Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF VACATED DATES AND OSC REGARDING DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ARNOLD C. WANG IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF HANK FARDEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement-Separate (OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department NWT, BERT GLENNON, JR, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status - Held Judge: JR |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement-Separate-of Undisputed F (FACTS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.