Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EUROPEAN CABINETS INC., ET AL. VS AMIR PORAT, ET AL.
On December 05, 2006 an othr breach contr/warr-not fraud (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge RICHARD ADLER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Van Nuys Courthouse East
Category
Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed-Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding Non-Calendar Matter - Order-Court Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request-Dismissal (With Prejudice, The Entire Action ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding OSC-Order to Show Cause (Re Reclassification to the courtof Limited Jurisdiction of Cross-Complaint, Only) - Off calendar-Case settled Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR (12/20/07ANDREW W. HYMAN, MEDIATOR) - Agreement (Full) Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Agreement (Full) (FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION ENDED IN FULL AGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Brief (IN RESP. TO OSC RE RECLASS. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding OSC-Order to Show Cause (Re Reclassification) - Continued Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding Conference-Post Mediation Status (Re Reclassification to the Courtof Limited Jurisdiction of Cross-Complaint Only.) - Advanced-This date & continued Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Re OSC Re Reclassification ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding Non-Calendar Matter (1. OSC re reclassification of thecross-complaint only remains on11-15-07 at 9:00 a.m.2. Order continuing 11-15-07 postmediation status conference onlyto 2-8-08 at 8:30 a.m.) - Order-Court Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order (to continue post mediation status conference (See 11-7-07 minute order for the order) ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer-Amended Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding Conference-Case Management (Motion to compel responses to forminterrpogatories;Motion to compel production ofdocuments & compliance;) - Held-Continued, case refd to Med Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order-Case Management (trial setting order and notice ) Filed by Court |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion-Compel ((amended) responses to request for production of documents and and compliance therewith; request for monetary sanctions against European Cabinets and atty of record Jay Smith) Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion-Compel ((amended) responses to form interrogatories (set one) and for monetary sanctions in the amount of $760.00 against European cabinets, inc and its atty of record, Jay Smith) Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer-Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWY, RICHARD ADLER, Presiding Conference-Status - Held-Continued Judge: RICHARD ADLER |
|
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Status Conference Filed by Court |
|
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Incoming Case Transfer Filed by Clerk |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Entered (European Cabinets, Inc., Morris Peryanti, Ronnie Peryanti **SET ASIDE 7/9/07 BY COURT** ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Counsel Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice-Case Management Conference | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per |