Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vodovoz Regina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bronshteyn Yasha, against Ward John, Does 1 To 20, represented by Tseng Jennifer Tina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with RICHARD B WOLFE presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeReclassified-Limited-Van Nuys |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWQ, RICHARD B WOLFE, Presiding Conference-Initial Status - Transferred-Limited Jurisdiction Judge: RICHARD B WOLFE |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWQ, RICHARD B WOLFE, Presiding Conference-Initial Status - Continued Judge: RICHARD B WOLFE |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer-Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice-Case Management Conference | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.