Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lastorta Nataly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Castranova Elia James, against Pacheco Hernandez Ana Gladys, Lebron Edwin, Does 1 To 50, represented by Skinner Maria H., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with MICHAEL HARWIN presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Other |
Case Cycle Time280 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Clerk, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Rmvd ADR-Dismissed priord Judge: ADR Clerk |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request-Dismissal (without prejudice entire action ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWM, MICHAEL HARWIN, Presiding Conference-Case Management (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEcont. 2x) - Held-Trial date set Judge: MICHAEL HARWIN |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney-Defendant |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF PUBLICATION ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department NWM, MICHAEL HARWIN, Presiding Conference-Case Management (cont. 1x) - Held-Continued Judge: MICHAEL HARWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.