Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vasquez Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Fang Jonathan, against Jimenez Mark, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with H. Don Christian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2016 |
CategoryOther Family Law (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: H. Don |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Default Setting (Judgment received pending hearing set for 11/13/2017 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Judgment filed and entered on 11/13/17 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vasquez, Jacqueline ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vasquez, Jacqueline ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.