Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moran Flavia Margarita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Medina Fidel Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Steven D. Blades presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions507 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time755 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Judgment packet sent to Dept T ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Judgment packet sent to Dept T 01/17/2018 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department D, Crabb, Rocky L., Presiding FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made Judge: Crabb Rocky L. |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department D, Crabb, Rocky L., Presiding FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made Judge: Rocky L. |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | 4th Notice Sent/Assignment to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - FCCR Conference (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Moran, Flavia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.