Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blanco Chelynn Gay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Geli Ma Antonette M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn - Filed and Entered on 2015-10-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn - Filed and Entered on 2015-10-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-08-15 ) | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn - Service Date on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement - Financial (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Blanco, Chelynn ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.