Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leal Alan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Leal Christina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Rocky L. Crabb presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions395 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time395 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Pomona South Dept. - D, Crabb, Rocky L., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Rocky L. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 04-21-16 ) | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received After Hearing (Judgment placed inside file pendin g hearing set for 6/27/16 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (/final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Leal, Alan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-07-16 ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.