Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clark Connie Joy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dyler Pattie L, against Clark Michael Joseph, represented by Burke Kimberly Renae, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Douglas M. Haigh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Set Security Group to Not Allow E-Filing | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | PACE - Declaration and Order Re: Fees ($900.00 ) | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | PACE - Declaration and Order Re: Fees ($900.00 ) | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Order (Granting Change of Venue to San Be rnardino County Superior Court ) | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Order - Findings and Order After Hearing | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Order (Granting Change of Venue to San Be rnardino County Superior Court ) | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration (re: fees ) | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration (re: fees ) | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Pomona South Dept. - C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Order Made Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Christian H. Don |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.