Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Continental Commercial Group, L.A. Commercial Group Inc, L.A. Commercial Group Inc. A California Corporation Dba Continental Commercial Group, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lemoine Jessica Lille, Lemoine Jessica L. Law Offices Of, against Dfl Warding And Trading Usa Fire Protecti, Jimenez Jose V., Jimenez Maria Laura, Urias Maria, Jimenez Laura, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Peter A. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management316 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time791 days |
Application - Application For Order For Publication of Summons [CCP 415.50]
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 04, 2017Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: December 04, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 04, 2017Complaint
Date: December 04, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: January 22, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration - Declaration Of Non-Service
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order - (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration - Declaration Of Jon Bird
Date: December 10, 2018Order for Publication - Order for Publication Of Summons
Date: December 10, 2018Declaration - Declaration Of Jessica L. Lemoine
Date: December 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)
Date: December 13, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: February 04, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: March 21, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION ASSIGNMENT
Date: June 10, 2019Order - ORDER RULING ON THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: June 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES AND INTEREST
Date: June 10, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT;)
Date: June 10, 2019Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: June 25, 2019Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (SAN DIEGO )
Date: August 01, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 24, 2019Writ - Return
Date: February 03, 2020Declaration Of Non-Service; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Application for Order to Publish; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Dismissal of Does Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Declaration Of Jon Bird; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Declaration Assignment; Filed by: L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration of John Birdc; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Court7COURT
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Declaration Of Jessica L. Lemoine; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Default entered as to Laura Jimenez; On the Complaint filed by L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC on
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC on
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Declaration of Jessica L. Lemoine; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Order for Publication Of Summons; Signed and Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Vincent Jimenez; On the Complaint filed by L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC on
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Dismissal of Does (Dismissal of Does 1 to 10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Request to Enter Default (*REJECTED* PLEASE SEE REJECTION LETTER OF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Summons Issued (RE FAC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Court
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Order Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by null
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (ON FAC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com (ON FAC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (of John Birdc) Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Order (Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Jon Bird) Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Assignment) Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Non-Service) Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment) Filed by L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of John Birdc)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Dismissal of Does (Dismissal of Does 1 to 10 )
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Summons Issued (RE FAC )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered
Date: March 02, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Dismissal of Does
Date: March 02, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 09, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Summons Issued
Date: April 02, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 19, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 12, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: April 25, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 25, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: May 08, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com
Date: June 15, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: June 26, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-07-19 00:00:00
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: July 27, 2018Declaration - OF NON SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -
Date: October 01, 2018Case Management Statement -
Date: September 19, 2018Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com (ON FAC )
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Application (For Order For Publication of Summons [CCP 415.50])
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Order for Publication (Of Summons)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Non-Service)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Declaration (Of Jessica L. Lemoine)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (ON FAC )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Non-Service of Sum & Com
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Request to Enter Default (*REJECTED* PLEASE SEE REJECTION LETTER OF 5/30/18 )
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Declaration (Of Jon Bird)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jessica L. Lemoine)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order (re: Request for Entry of Default as to Vincent Jimenez)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Declaration (Assignment)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Order (Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re: Underlying Cause of Action in Support of Request to Enter Default)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment;))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re: Attorney's Fees and Interest)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re Method of Calculating Interest)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 24, 2019Writ of Execution ((San Diego ))
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.