Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Baer William Joseph, Chermak David Lawrence, State Of California, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Day Esq. Montie S., against Farmers Group Inc, Farmers Insurance Exchange, represented by Lemieux James P. Esq., Mackie Craig William Esq, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Gloria White-Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions682 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1075 days |
Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: April 05, 2018Complaint
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Other - (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP)
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULINGS DEPT J)
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF PATICE A GORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER)
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Supplement
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Other - (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULING DEPT J)
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Other - (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULING DEPT J)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULING DEPT J)
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF JOINDER)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Exhibit List (VOLUME OF EXHIBITS)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF PATICE A GORE)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request (FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF PATRICK CATO)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF DAVID SILVA)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request (FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Request (FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULING DEPT J)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULING DEPT J)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Supplement
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULINGS DEPT J)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULINGS DEPT J)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULINGS DEPT J)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Other - (LAW AND MOTION RULINGS)
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion Off Calendar)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOT IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE DEF INS AND CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF INSURANCE)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial;))
Date: March 12, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 01, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MOT IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE CHP REPORT AND CHP OFFICER OPINIONS AS TO FAULT)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: March 06, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 19, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: August 23, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.