Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Skyscraper Brewing Company Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Noyes Christopher Brandon, against Successor Agency To The Industry Urban, City Of Industry, Perez Vincent, Fresch Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Dan Thomas Oki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDan Thomas Oki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management608 days |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions565 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time906 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-06-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Objection Document Filed
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause Hearing)
Date: November 08, 2018Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER))
Date: October 29, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: October 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 10, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference Date)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.