Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
As Co-Executors Of The Estate Of Jeanne Merrell, Kimberly Aguilar, As Co-Executors Of The Estate Of Jeanne Merrell, Steven Ruley, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cox, Larry R, against Holcomb, Lee Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Catherine D. Purcell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine D. Purcell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
October 31, 2008 | Hearing | Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed | |
October 27, 2008 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered TAMMY HOLCOMB |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered TAMMY HOLCOMB |
|
October 24, 2008 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered LEE THOMAS HOLCOMB |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered LEE THOMAS HOLCOMB |
|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for AS CO-EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF JEANNE MERRELL, STEVEN RULEY (PL-1). Received from THE LAW OFFICE OF YOUNG WOOLDRIDGE, check no(s) 34708. Receipt #416916 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT You are notified that judgment in this cause was entered on: Date: 10/15/2008 Doc. No.: VOL XII Page(s): 32 Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT You are notified that judgment in this cause was entered on: Date: 10/15/2008 Doc. No.: VOL XII Page(s): 32 |
|
October 15, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial DATE RECORDED:10/15/08 DOCUMENT NO:VOL XII PAGE(S):32 JUDGMENT FOR:PLAINTIFF STEVEN RULEY AND KIMBERLEY AGUILAR, AS CO-EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF JEANNE MERRELL, AKA JEANNE LOU MERRELL JUDGMENT AGAINST:DEFENDANT LEE THOMAS HOLCOMB, TAMMY HOLCOMB, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY, AND DOES 1-40 FOR POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1711 BODFISH CANYON RD, BODFISH CA, 1711 1/2 BODFISH CANYON RD, BODFISH, CA. |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for AS CO-EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF JEANNE MERRELL, STEVEN RULEY (PL-1). Received from THE LAW OFFICE OF YOUNG WOOLDRIDGE, check no(s) 34708. Receipt #416916 for amount of $15.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.