Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Access Capital Services, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Silver, Steven A, against Olson, Jeanne, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Catherine D. Purcell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine D. Purcell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2186 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2011 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
December 05, 2011 | Hearing | Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
November 21, 2011 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
November 15, 2010 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:E. WARREN GUBLER NEW ATTORNEY:STEVEN A SILVER |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY:E. WARREN GUBLER NEW ATTORNEY:STEVEN A SILVER |
|
June 30, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1820 Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT'S RULING WITH REGARDS TO THE MATTER SUBMITTED ON 6/23/2010 IS ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNINGS HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. JUDGMENT DEBTOR SHALL PAY $150.00 PER PAY PERIOD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR, ACCESS CAPITAL SERVICES, INC. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. THE COURT'S RULING WITH REGARDS TO THE MATTER SUBMITTED ON 6/23/2010 IS ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNINGS HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. JUDGMENT DEBTOR SHALL PAY $150.00 PER PAY PERIOD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR, ACCESS CAPITAL SERVICES, INC. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 23, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1490 Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION CLAIM OF EXEMPTION NO APPEARANCE BY THE PLAINTIFF, ACCESS CAPITAL SERVICES, INC. JEANNE OLSON (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CASE TAKEN UNDERSUBMISSION THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
June 23, 2010 | Hearing |
4122 Claim of Exemption Hearing Entered. |
|
June 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Claim of Exemption
Judge: To Be, Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.