Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Baxter, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 1999 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Warrant Cleared | |
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Warrant
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
October 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
February 07, 2000 | Docket Event | Arrest Warrant Issued | |
January 13, 2000 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Notice to Appear
Judge: Dawson, James F |
|
January 10, 2000 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 20, 1999 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear | |
December 07, 1999 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.