Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Karl Rogers, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Donald Marzette, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
On the Petition filed by Rogers vs marzette on 09/30/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 updated: Result Date to 11/23/2021 Result Type to Held Event |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail DSM002 |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Karl Rogers Denied Ruling |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notes: Packets ready for pick up under "Rogers" Filing |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment 11/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 519 ScheduleHearing |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order CH-110 Request for CH-110 |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted Ruling |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Karl Rogers Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.