Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Michelle Steinberg, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Cassandra Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing)
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing)
Date: January 11, 2023CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 11, 2023Minute Order (Court Order Court Continuance)
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing] Issued by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Amended CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Amended CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Amended Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Amended CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Issued by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Pending in WQ by:
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.