Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adam Paul Bienenstock, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Randal Wayne Hester, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 updated: Result Date to 12/16/2021 Result Type to Held Event |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended CH-130 Restraining Order After Hearing (Civil Harassment) Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-130 Restraining Order After Hearing (Civil Harassment) Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-200 Proof of Personal Service (Civil Harassment) Filed by: Adam Paul Bienenstock (Petitioner) As to: Randal Wayne Hester (Respondent) Service Type: Personal Document |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-250 Proof of Service of Response By Mail (Civil Harassment) Filed by: Randal Wayne Hester (Respondent) As to: Adam Paul Bienenstock (Petitioner) Document |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-120 Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders Filed by: Randal Wayne Hester (Respondent) Document |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/16/2021 09:00 AM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.