Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Audrey L Knight, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Clonisha Villegas, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 updated: Result Date to 01/11/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment is DENIED. Minute Order |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other - CH-200 Proof of Personal Service on Denied TRO Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/11/2022 09:00 AM Event |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing) Minute Order |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other - DV200-Invalid POS Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Event |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 519 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/30/2021 09:00 AM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.