Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cooper , Melody, filed a(n) Late Claim - Administrative case against East Bay Municipal Utility District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Patrick R. McKinney II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick R. McKinney II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryTo File Late Claim |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeLate Claim |
Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: Melody Cooper (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: East Bay Municipal Utility District (Respondent)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply file tort claim Filed
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Opposition to Petition to File Late Claim Filed
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Petition to file Late Claim Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration ISO Specially Appearing Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's to File Late Claim Filed
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Petition to file Late Claim - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Petition to file Late Claim Taken Under Submission
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Petition to file Late Claim 08/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.