Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Caponigro , Craig, Craig Caponigro, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Harris , Scott, Kledzik, Sean, Scott Harris, Sean Kledzik, represented by Alison P. Buchanan, Buchanan, Alison P., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Dennis W. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 07, 2022Stipulation And Order Re: Trial-Related Deadlines Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 14, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 25, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 25, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Craig Caponigro
Date: May 11, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Amended Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 27, 2023Order re: Jury Trial Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 27, 2023Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 27, 2023Amended Order re: Jury Trial Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 27, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Craig Caponigro Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Case Management Statement Filed by: Scott Harris (Defendant); Sean Kledzik (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/25/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: May 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail on Answer of Defendants Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Statement of Scott Harris, Sean Kledzik Filed
Date: September 10, 2020Answer to Complaint Filed for Scott Harris, Sean Kledzik
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Scott Harris (Defendant); Sean Kledzik (Defendant)
Date: January 14, 2022Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Scott Harris, Sean Kledzik
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/25/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Craig Caponigro
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Craig Caponigro Filed
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on Answer of Defendants Filed
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Scott Harris, Sean Kledzik Filed
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.