Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Arena Solutions, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pollak, Robert L., Robert L. Pollak, against Primus Power Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Patrick J. Zika presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management138 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial355 days |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: March 02, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Granted
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed for Defendant
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Primus Power Corporation
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/26/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Granted
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Filed for Primus Power Corporation
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Arena Solutions, Inc
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: March 03, 2021Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: March 02, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: February 24, 2021Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 24, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 18, 2021Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Granted
Date: February 18, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 18, 2021Notes: (*MSC set for February 24, 2021 in D-302 at 9:00AM via BlueJeans Video Conference)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00TR - Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Granted
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 04/12/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: February 08, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 08, 2021Case Management Statement of Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: February 05, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved as Counsel Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 03, 2021Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 518 date: 02/18/2021 time: 02:30 PM
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record - Motion Rescheduled
Date: February 03, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: February 03, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 02/08/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 25, 2021Proposed Order
Date: December 15, 2020Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: December 15, 2020Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Hearing Confirmed for 02/03/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed for Defendant
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Civil Jury Trial 03/22/2021 08:45 AM D- 518
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 01/25/2021 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 302
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 30, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 30, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 30, 2020Case Management Statement of Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: June 16, 2020Answer to Complaint Filed for Primus Power Corporation
Date: June 01, 2020Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: May 22, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 19, 2020Case Management Conf Continuance 06/30/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: April 29, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 26, 2019Case Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 05/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: November 25, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 09, 2020Case Management Statement of Arena Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: February 24, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 26, 2019Proof of Service on Complaint As to Primus Power Corporation Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/26/2019 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 06, 2019Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: July 11, 2019Initial Case Management Conference 11/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: July 19, 2019Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Granted
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: July 19, 2019Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Ronni MacLaren Filed for Primus Power Corporation
Date: August 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Arena Solutions, Inc
Date: July 11, 2019Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: July 11, 2019Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.