Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porchia, Doris, Porchia, Stephanie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against City Of Oakland, Coral, Natasha, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ronni B. MacLaren presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial137 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time265 days |
Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Natasha Coral, City of Oakland
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephanie Porchia
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Natasha Coral Filed
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stephanie Porchia, Doris Porchia Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/28/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: March 08, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Settlement Filed for Stephanie Porchia, Doris Porchia
Date: April 26, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.