Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Doe, John, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against Regents Of The University Of Califoria, A California Corporation, represented by Jonathan D Miller, Miller, Jonathan D, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jeffrey S. Brand presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management5 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2018 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions547 days |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: March 21, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: June 18, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: December 12, 2018Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Re Lodging Amended Administrative Record
Date: October 05, 2018Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: October 10, 2018Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: October 16, 2018Reply Filed
Date: October 04, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: December 12, 2018Re-Notice of Errata Re Opposition to Petitioner's Opening Brief Filed
Date: October 05, 2018Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: November 06, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 06, 2018Case Management Conference 06/18/2018 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: March 26, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Doe
Date: March 21, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 23, 2018Case Management Statement of John Doe Filed
Date: June 06, 2018Declaration in Support Filed
Date: February 22, 2019Notice of Lodging Administrative Record Lodged
Date: July 30, 2018Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: November 06, 2018Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: June 18, 2018Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration Filed
Date: March 14, 2019Brief Filed
Date: August 16, 2018Brief Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Re-Notice of Lodging Amended Administrative Record Lodged
Date: October 05, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: March 21, 2019Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 11, 2019Motion for Reconsideration Taken Under Submission
Date: April 11, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: October 16, 2018Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: October 16, 2018Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 16, 2018Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by John Doe
Date: November 25, 2019Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: November 28, 2018Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued
Date: November 26, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: November 28, 2018Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2019Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Default Issued
Date: December 17, 2019Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed
Date: December 30, 2019Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed
Date: December 13, 2018Opposition Filed
Date: March 08, 2019Order Denying Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate Taken Under Submission
Date: December 13, 2018Motion for Reconsideration Filed for Petitioner
Date: February 14, 2019Order Continuing Hearing Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: December 19, 2018Proposed Judgment Received
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Certification of Record Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: March 21, 2019Clerk's Certificate Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Motion for Reconsideration Granted
Date: April 29, 2019Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 29, 2019Judgment Entire Action Filed
Date: September 19, 2019Judgment Entered
Date: September 19, 2019Order from Appellate Court (Name extension) Certified for Publication Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Appeal Filed Filed by: With Deposit: No
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Receipt for Record on Appeal of John Doe Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Billing Notice Filed
Date: January 02, 2020Remittitur (Name Extension) Filed by: Clerk Disposition Type: Affirmed
Date: January 07, 2022Brief Filed
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Regents of The university of Califoria, a California Corporation
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Administrative Record Lodged
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference 06/18/2018 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Regents of The university of Califoria, a California Corporation Filed
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Regents of The university of Califoria, a California Corporatio
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Re Lodging Amended Administrative Record
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Re-Notice of Lodging Amended Administrative Record Lodged
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Re-Notice of Errata Re Opposition to Petitioner's Opening Brief Filed
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Regents of The university of Califoria, a California Corporation Filed
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of John Doe Filed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Doe
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Order Continuing Hearing Filed
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Regents of The university of Califoria, a
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed for Petitioner
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Taken Under Submission
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Judgment Entire Action Filed
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Order Denying Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate Filed
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Continued
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Billing Notice Filed
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Petition for Writ of Mandate - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal of John Doe Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Taken Under Submission
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Certification of Record Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Motion for Reconsideration - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice to Court Reporter to Prepare Transcripts Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by John Doe
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Granted
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration Filed
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.