Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prado, Efren D, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Upshaw, Kerwin, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael E. Ballachey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2016 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2016 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Michael Ballachey |
||
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Amended Minutes | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/17/2016 01:35 PM D- 514 | |
October 27, 2016 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Andrew Steckler |
||
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 11/17/2016 01:35 PM D- 511 | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Reissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 10/27/2016 01:35 PM D- 514 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.