Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sadeghi, Mehdi, Simonson, Mario, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Simonson, Mario, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jo-Lynne Q. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial140 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1429 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Dismissed
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Mehdi Sadeghi
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/02/2016 03:00 PM D- 18
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 13, 2019Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mehdi Sadeghi
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Report Filed
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 14, 2018Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: December 14, 2018Initial Case Management Conference 05/31/2016 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous Status Summary of Settlement and Response to OSC Filed
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Mario Simonson
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mario Simonson Filed
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/09/2017 09:00 AM D- 31
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Mehdi Sadeghi
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 10, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Mario Simonson
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.