Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Pratap, Mahendra, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial209 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time213 days |
Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To MAHENDRA PRATAP Filed
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed
Date: July 12, 2016Proof of Service on Complaint As to MAHENDRA PRATAP Filed
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for SYNCHRONY BANK
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: June 16, 2016Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: August 01, 2016Declaration RE VENUE Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 08/01/2016 09:00 AM D- 14
Date: June 29, 2016Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected
Date: July 26, 2016Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 05, 2016Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 01, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.