Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amezcua, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Bio Fuel Systems Inc., Zarate, Alonso Palomino, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management137 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial525 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1484 days |
Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/16/2016 02:30 PM D- 302
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party ALONSO PALOMINO ZARATE, BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/16/2016 02:30 PM D- 510
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause Filed
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for JOSE AMEZCUA
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party ALONSO PALOMINO ZARATE, BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Denied
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for JOSE AMEZCUA
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to ALONSO PALOMINO ZARATE Filed
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to ALONSO PALOMINO ZARATE, BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Entered
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Order Granting Stipulation Setting Aside Default of Bio Fuel Systems Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service CM order 12/13/17 Filed
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Mngt Order, dtd 9-6-17 Filed
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail of Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2017 02:30 PM D- 302
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC.
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Statement of Damages Filed
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Declaration of Rodney A Augustine Filed
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party ALONSO PALOMINO ZARATE, BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2017 09:00 AM D- 302
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default Granted
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00General Denial To Complaint Filed for BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC.
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Email notice Filed
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/20/2018 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support Motion for Relief from Entry of Default & Default Judgment Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration in regards to Settlement Filed
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 01/09/2019 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff JOSE AMEZCUA
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion for Relief from Entry of Default and Default Judgment Granted
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: October 23, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: October 31, 2019Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered
Date: January 23, 2020Motion for Relief from Entry of Default and Default Judgment Filed by BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC.
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/18/2019 02:30 PM D- 520
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: November 08, 2019Case Management Statement of BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail re Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party BIO FUEL SYSTEMS INC. Filed
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of JOSE AMEZCUA Filed
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: January 21, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.